Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1407 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19210 Week
» 72226 Month
» 191753 Year
» 3218606 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1554 |
m/e |
04/1891 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5078 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
65078 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J21 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
148 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 04/1891 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 04/03/1957 off Tweedmouth (52D) |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51F |
West Auckland |
w/e |
06/08/1950 |
ALLOC |
51A |
Darlington |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
ALLOC |
52D |
Tweedmouth |
4w/e |
18/06/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/03/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1911 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
12/1921 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
12/1921 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1891 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1554 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 148 |
|
|
04/1911 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
|
|
12/1921 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
|
|
12/1921 |
Modification |
Modification: Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5078 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Darlington (DAR) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65078 |
|
|
06/08/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
18/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) |
|
|
04/03/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65078 from Tweedmouth (52D) |
|
|
04/1957 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |
|
|