Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 4503 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20115 Week
» 118760 Month
» 321424 Year
» 3348277 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1567 |
m/e |
07/1891 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5094 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
65094 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J21 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
151 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 07/1891 |
Withdrawal |
During 02/1950 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1891 |
NEV |
|
Neville Hill |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
DAR |
|
Darlington |
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
SEL |
|
Selby |
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
02/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
DAR |
Darlington |
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
ALLOC |
SEL |
Selby |
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
WDN |
50C |
Selby |
on |
20/02/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1908 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
06/1908 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1891 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1567 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 151 |
|
|
06/1908 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
|
|
06/1908 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5094 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neville Hill (NEV) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 65094 but not taken up |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) |
|
|
09/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (SEL) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Withdrawn |
|
|
|
03/1950 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |
|
|