Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 328 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18131 Week
» 71147 Month
» 190674 Year
» 3217527 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
442 |
m/e |
06/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5734 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
65734 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J26 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 06/1904 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 14/10/1958 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 4 mths , 13 dys |
Information |
Round cab spectacles by Grouping |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1904 |
NPT |
|
Newport (Teeside) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
51L |
|
Thornaby |
5w/e |
14/06/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/10/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51L |
Thornaby |
on |
08/06/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/10/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1918 |
Diagram 57 boiler fitted |
12/1945 |
Diagram 57A boiler fitted |
11/1951 |
Diagram 57 boiler fitted |
03/1955 |
Diagram 57A boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1904 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 442 Built at Darlington Works Diagram P2 boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1918 |
Modification |
Diagram 57 boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1945 |
Modification |
Diagram 57A boiler fitted |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5734 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newport (Teeside) (NPT) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65734 |
|
|
11/1951 |
Modification |
Diagram 57 boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1955 |
Modification |
Diagram 57A boiler fitted |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
14/10/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65734 |
|
|