Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 610 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18413 Week
» 71429 Month
» 190956 Year
» 3217809 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1130 |
m/e |
10/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5743 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
British Railways |
65743 |
on |
16/12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J26 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 10/1904 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 04/06/1962 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 8 mths , 5 dys |
Information |
Round cab spectacles by Grouping |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1904 |
NPT |
|
Newport (Teeside) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
51L |
|
Thornaby |
5w/e |
14/06/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
04/06/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51L |
Thornaby |
on |
08/06/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/06/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1915 |
Diagram 57 boiler fitted |
10/1939 |
Diagram 57A boiler fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1954 |
Darlington Works |
North Road Works have completed Class 2 MT 78014/5, and the diesel-electric shunters are now all in traffic, No. 13081 completing the order. Engines for works include 60806/18/37/88, 61010/37/69/84, 61124, 61273, 61418/28, 62381, 62715/20/44, 63437/50/61, 65061, 65676 (to scrap yard), 65743, 65778, 67658/90, 67715/36/9/47/59/89/91, 90089, 90116, 90270/80, 90400/1/31/9, 90554, 90600. |
SLS/195404 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1904 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1130 Built at Darlington Works Diagram P2 boiler fitted |
|
|
06/1915 |
Modification |
Diagram 57 boiler fitted |
|
|
10/1939 |
Modification |
Diagram 57A boiler fitted |
|
|
20/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5743 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newport (Teeside) (NPT) |
|
|
16/12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65743 |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
04/06/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65743 |
|
|