Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2595 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16001 Week
» 69017 Month
» 188544 Year
» 3215397 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1018 |
m/e |
09/1906 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5792 |
on |
17/03/1946 |
British Railways |
65792 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J27 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 09/1906 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 10/05/1965 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 8 mths , 9 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52F |
Blyth (North) |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
10/05/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 07/1943 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
by 02/1956 |
LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted |
by 12/1958 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1906 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1018 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
07/1943 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
17/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5792 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Percy Main (PMN) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65792 |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
02/1956 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
12/1958 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
10/05/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65792 |
|
|
11/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|