Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 767 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14173 Week
» 67189 Month
» 186716 Year
» 3213569 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1027 |
m/e |
05/1908 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5817 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
British Railways |
65817 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1967 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51L |
Thornaby |
4w/e |
07/03/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/10/1964 |
REINS |
52E |
Percy Main |
w/e |
10/10/1964 |
ALLOC |
52G |
Sunderland |
4w/e |
27/03/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
01/05/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 07/1946 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
by 09/1952 |
LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted |
by 01/1960 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/11/1966 |
Allocation of J27 class (Sunderland) |
North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. |
SLS/196701 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1908 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1027 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 18362 |
|
|
20/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5817 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65817 |
|
|
09/1952 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
01/1960 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
29/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
17/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
27/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) |
|
|
01/05/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65817 |
|
|
08/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|