Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4252 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17658 Week
» 70674 Month
» 190201 Year
» 3217054 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1029 |
m/e |
05/1908 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5819 |
on |
27/01/1946 |
British Railways |
65819 |
on |
15/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J27 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L281 |
Works Number |
18364 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 05/1908 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1966 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1967 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1908 |
NBH |
|
Blyth (North) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
09/1966 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52FS |
|
4w/e |
12/10/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 03/1945 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1908 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1029 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 18364 |
|
|
03/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
27/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5819 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Blyth (North) (NBH) |
|
|
15/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65819 |
|
|
09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65819 |
|
|
02/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|