Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 4292 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17698 Week
» 70714 Month
» 190241 Year
» 3217094 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1224 |
m/e |
08/1908 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5853 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
65853 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J27 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
5117 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 08/1908 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 14/02/1967 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 6 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1967 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1908 |
SUN |
|
Sunderland |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/02/1967 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51E |
Stockton |
4w/e |
01/11/1958 |
ALLOC |
51L |
Thornaby |
on |
14/06/1959 |
ALLOC |
52G |
Sunderland |
5w/e |
05/05/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/02/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 03/1946 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/11/1966 |
Allocation of J27 class (Sunderland) |
North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. |
SLS/196701 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1908 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1224 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5117 |
|
|
03/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5853 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65853 |
|
|
14/02/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65853 |
|
|
05/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|