Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1591 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14997 Week
» 68013 Month
» 187540 Year
» 3214393 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2348 |
m/e |
05/1922 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5870 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
British Railways |
65870 |
m/e |
04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J27 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1154 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 05/1922 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 12/10/1964 |
Service Life |
42 yrs, 5 mths , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 04/1944 |
Superheater removed |
by 04/1944 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1922 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2348 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1154 |
|
|
04/1944 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
04/1944 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheater removed |
|
|
01/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5870 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stockton (SKN) |
|
|
06/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (NBH) |
|
|
04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65870 |
|
|
25/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) |
|
|
16/02/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltburn (51K) |
|
|
16/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
07/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) |
|
|
23/02/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) |
|
|
14/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
12/10/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65870 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|