Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1901 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19704 Week
» 72720 Month
» 192247 Year
» 3219100 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2357 |
m/e |
06/1922 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5879 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
65879 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J27 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1163 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1922 |
Withdrawal |
4w/e Sat 09/09/1967 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 3 mths , 9 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1967 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52B |
Heaton |
4w/e |
15/09/1956 |
ALLOC |
52FN |
|
4w/e |
02/11/1957 |
ALLOC |
52FS |
|
4w/e |
05/11/1966 |
ALLOC |
52G |
Sunderland |
4w/e |
17/06/1967 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
09/09/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 06/1945 |
Superheater removed |
by 06/1945 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
by 02/1953 |
LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted |
by 06/1956 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/11/1966 |
Allocation of J27 class (South Blyth) |
North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. |
SLS/196701 |
02/07/1967 |
Eastern Region (North Eastern Section) steam stock (Sunderland) |
Steam stock has been reduced to 124 as from 2nd July. The allocation of following classes is as under:- Q6 Sunderland: 63395. Tyne Dock: 63344/87, 63431. J27 Sunderland: 65795, 65811/55/79/82/92/94. K1 West Hartlepool: 62045. Tyne Dock: 62005/07/11/50/60. B1 Low Moor: 61030 Nyala, 61306/37. Jubilee Holbeck: 45562 Alberta, 45593 Kolhapur, 45697 Achilles. C1.5 Holbeck: 44826/28/52/96, 44912/43/83, 45080, 45219/73, 45428. Normanton: 44824/54/57, 44990, 45075. Low Moor: 44662/94, 45208. Of the 8F remaining on the N.E. Region, 4 are at Holbeck and 24 at Royston. The W.D. 2-8-0 are allocated to West Hartlepool (6), Sunderland (7), Normanton (14) and Low Moor (D; the 2-6-4Ts to Holbeck (4), Normanton (7), and Low Moor (5) and the C1.4 2-6-0s to West Hartlepool (D, North Blyth (4), Holbeck (2) and Normanton (3). There is still one steam locomotive in Departmental Stock J72 0-6-OT Deptl. 58 (ex 69005). |
SLS/196708 |
13/08/1967 |
Sunderland MPD |
On Sunday, 13th August, the following were on Sunderland shed: 63395, 63437/58, 65789/95, 65804/11/2/55/79/80/2/92/4, 90112/35, 90321/48/78/82, 90417, 90698, D2110, D3078, D3678, D6824/8/96. |
SLS/196709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1922 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2357 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1163 |
|
|
06/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
06/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheater removed |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5879 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Blyth (North) (NBH) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65879 |
|
|
02/1953 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
06/1956 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
09/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
05/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) (N.Blyth to S.Blyth) |
|
|
17/06/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65879 |
|
|
11/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|