Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 56 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17859 Week
» 70875 Month
» 190402 Year
» 3217255 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2384 |
m/e |
06/1923 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5886 |
on |
23/01/1946 |
British Railways |
65886 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J27 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1193 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1923 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 24/08/1959 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 2 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52F |
Blyth (North) |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
ALLOC |
52B |
Heaton |
4w/e |
15/09/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
24/08/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 06/1947 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
by 07/1954 |
Superheater removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1923 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2384 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1193 |
|
|
23/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5886 |
|
|
06/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65886 |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
19/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
07/1954 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheater removed |
|
|
24/08/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65886 |
|
|
10/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|