Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 157 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17960 Week
» 70976 Month
» 190503 Year
» 3217356 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2389 |
m/e |
07/1923 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5891 |
on |
17/03/1946 |
British Railways |
65891 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J27 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1198 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 07/1923 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 23/12/1963 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 5 mths , 23 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
54A |
Sunderland |
4w/e |
03/10/1959 |
ALLOC |
52FS |
|
4w/e |
28/11/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
23/12/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 02/1947 |
Superheater removed |
by 02/1947 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/01/1964 |
Darlington MPD (Stored) |
Stored: 46415/73, 61004/255, 63441, 65852/64/91, 68024, 69020, 90100/249/301/655. Ex Works 73138, 75052/58, 90149. Repair Shops Under Light Repairs: 42477, 62059, 63347, 90011. Visitor on Enthusiast Special: 70000. |
SLS/196402 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1923 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2389 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1198 |
|
|
17/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5891 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
02/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheater removed |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Selby (SEL) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65891 |
|
|
19/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) |
|
|
14/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
23/12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65891 |
|
|
02/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|