Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 567 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18370 Week
» 71386 Month
» 190913 Year
» 3217766 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
381 |
m/e |
04/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9381 |
m/e |
07/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4511 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64511 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1910 |
CAR |
|
Carlisle Canal |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
66A |
|
Polmadie |
4w/e |
19/02/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
12/10/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
66A |
Polmadie |
4w/e |
19/02/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
12/10/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
03/1947 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1950 |
Inverurie Works |
Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 61529/52, 62247, 4473, 64511, 65250, 5322, ex-L.M.S. 57260, 57317, 17642. |
SLS/195004 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1910 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 381 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19092 |
|
|
07/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9381 |
|
|
06/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4511 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Canal (CAR) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64511 |
|
|
19/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
12/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64511 |
|
|