Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 553 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19464 Week
» 84418 Month
» 287082 Year
» 3313935 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
686 |
m/e |
02/1892 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9686 |
m/e |
09/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5257 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
65257 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3776 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 02/1892 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 08/10/1962 off Grangemouth (65F) |
Service Life |
70 yrs, 8 mths , 7 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65F |
Grangemouth |
4w/e |
07/04/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
08/10/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1919 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
07/1919 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/08/1947 |
Inverurie Works |
On 20/8 the following locos. were in the Works yard: 'D31' 2071, 'J36' (Number painted out but carrying plate 9653 - identified as 5229), old No. 'D41' 6879 (old No.), 'J36' 5251/72/87/91, 5302/32/36 (the latter marked 'scrap') 'G10' 7505, all complete; whilst those stripped were: 'D40' 2266/80, 'D31' (bearing plate 9765, old No.), 2067, 'J36' 5212/19. Locos. in the Works were 'D40' 2262/75, 'D41' 2234/42/44, 'J35' 4463/82/84, 'J36' 5257/69/84, 5325, while 'D41' 2256 and 'G5' 7287 were ex Works freshly painted. |
SLS/194710 |
05/06/1949 |
Inverurie Works |
Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 61502, 4484, 5232/57, 65281, 5307, 65340. ex L.M.S. No. 4251. |
SLS/194907 |
12/06/1963 |
Inverurie Works (Scrapped) |
In Works: 42273, 45176, 61076, 61103, D8032. Shopped in four weeks ending 7th June : 64588, D362, D6155, 44960, 65930, 61404. Scrapped in same period: 64581, 65217/57/304, 64822, 65928; 64499, 65237. Being scrapped: 57617/31, 68346, 90077/575. Awaiting scrapping or shopping-64599/600, 64795, 64950/86. 64946 was waiting at Kittybrewster. |
SLS/196307 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1892 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 686 Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 3776 Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1919 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1919 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
09/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9686 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5257 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Polmont (POL) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65257 |
|
|
24/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
08/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65257 from Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
05/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|