Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1834 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19637 Week
» 72653 Month
» 192180 Year
» 3219033 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
88 |
m/e |
06/1918 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9088 |
m/e |
03/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4556 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
64556 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
08/02/1963 |
Inverurie Works (Scrapped) |
In shops: 64610, D263; shopped in previous four weeks. 64592/7, D261, D2411. Scrapped between 21st January and 8th February: 57645, 64510/43/56, 65268, 68448/53/70. |
SLS/196303 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1918 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 88 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21925 |
|
|
03/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9088 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4556 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stirling (STG) |
|
|
15/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (DFU) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64556 |
|
|
22/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
17/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64556 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
05/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|