Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 908 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14314 Week
» 67330 Month
» 186857 Year
» 3213710 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
1411 |
on |
03/03/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5910 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
65910 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J38 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1310 |
To Service |
Thu 03/03/1926 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 14/07/1966 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 4 mths , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1966 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
03/03/1926 |
THJ |
|
Thornton Junction |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/07/1966 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/07/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1945 |
Screw Reverse fitted |
11/1945 |
Steam Reverse Removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
15/10/1962 |
Inverurie Works |
In shops: 45461, 64595, 65910; waiting: 80093. Awaiting scrapping: 44008, 47168, 47536, 57331/378/613, 65313, 69204. Scrapped five weeks ended 12/10; 57445/671, 64598/607, 64604/30, 64480/637/794. |
SLS/196211 |
09/11/1962 |
Inverurie Works (In shops) |
In shops : 42262/9, 61397, 65910, 80093, D260, D6142/4/7. Ex Works 45461, 64595. Scrapped in last 4 weeks-44008/253, 47168, 47536, 57331/613, 65313, 69204. Awaiting scrap: 44254, 57378, 64478, 90513. |
SLS/196212 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/03/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1411 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1310 |
|
|
11/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Screw Reverse fitted |
|
|
11/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Reverse Removed |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5910 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65910 |
|
|
14/07/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65910 |
|
|
11/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|