Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 335 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18138 Week
» 71154 Month
» 190681 Year
» 3217534 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
1447 |
on |
28/05/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5934 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
65934 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J38 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1334 |
To Service |
Sat 28/05/1926 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 31/12/1966 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 7 mths , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1967 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1946 |
Screw Reverse fitted |
04/1946 |
Steam Reverse Removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/05/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1447 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1334 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Screw Reverse fitted |
|
|
04/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Reverse Removed |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5934 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU) |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65934 |
|
|
27/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
31/12/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65934 |
|
|
09/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|