|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 19/10/1928 | 05/12/1928 | 48 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 31/01/1929 | 07/02/1929 | 8 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gateshead Works | 25/08/1930 | 09/10/1930 | 46 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/01/1933 | 22/02/1933 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 1920 (Diagram 97) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 25/02/1935 | 04/04/1935 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 1904 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 01/07/1936 | 28/08/1936 | 59 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 21/04/1937 | 28/05/1937 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 1902 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1939 | 07/10/1939 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2143 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/03/1941 | 18/04/1941 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 1922 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 25/10/1944 | 18/11/1944 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 1913 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 05/05/1945 | 19/05/1945 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/08/1947 | 27/09/1947 | 47 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/04/1950 | 20/05/1950 | 25 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64704 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 27/01/1953 | 28/02/1953 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 2564 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 03/07/1956 | 11/08/1956 | 40 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Inverurie Works | 18/02/1960 | 21/04/1960 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 27550 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 02/10/1961 | 14/10/1961 | 13 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/08/1947 | Cowlairs Works | On 24/8 the following withdrawn locos. were in the Works yard: 'Dl' 2212, 'D29' 2415 and 'D31' 2068, the last two having been stripped; whilst those seen here newly painted were: 'D29' 2411 (green), 'J37' 4617 and 'J39' 4704. Locos. awaiting works, some of which had been stripped were: 'J39' 4711, 4817/40/49/65, 4919/22/28/42; 'K2' 1732/46/51/68/91; 'K3' 1879; 'D1' 2216; 'Dll' 2691; 'J38' 5909; 'J36' 5223/61; 'J35' 4503; 'J37' 4546/48/65/67, 4607/15; 'D31' 2059; 'D34' 2489; 'C15' 7453/65/66, 'N14' 9121; 'N15' 9191, 9214. The Erecting Shop was full and included: 'K2' 1720/34/52; 'K3' 1855; 'J39' 4912/16; 'J38' 5901/12; 'Dll' 2684/87 and 'Y9' 8120/22. | SLS/194710 |
30/10/1947 | Eastfield MPD | Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during October were: Nos. 1743/46/51/68, *1791 (green), 1879, 2432/62/73/95, 2685/91 (both green), 4526/65/67/98, 4607, 4703/04, 4852, 4926/28/42, 5345, 7461/69/97, *8474 (green), 9147/91 an 9205; whilst those observed on 2/11 were *1995 (green), 4608, 4938 an 9500 . Nos. 1701, 1996 an 1998 were observed here fitted with snow-ploughs. Nos. 2479, 4474 an 4633 have been supplying steam to the canteen here during the period approximately from 15/10 to 26/10, while No. 5308 is again in use as a stationary boiler, after having been temporarily replaced by No. 5339. | SLS/194712 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/10/1926 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1452 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1339 Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
25/11/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
19/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1928. Dep: 05/12/1928. | ||
31/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/01/1929. Dep: 07/02/1929. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
25/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1930. Dep: 09/10/1930. | ||
17/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1933. Dep: 22/02/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1920 (Diagram 97) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
25/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1935. Dep: 04/04/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1904 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
01/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/07/1936. Dep: 28/08/1936. | ||
21/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1937. Dep: 28/05/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1902 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1939. Dep: 07/10/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2143 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1941. Dep: 18/04/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1922 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1944. Dep: 18/11/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1913 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/05/1945. Dep: 19/05/1945. | ||
27/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4704 | ||
12/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1947. Dep: 27/09/1947. | ||
18/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
24/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
26/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/04/1950. Dep: 20/05/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64704 |
||
27/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1953. Dep: 28/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2564 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/07/1956. Dep: 11/08/1956. | ||
01/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
18/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1960. Dep: 21/04/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27550 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/10/1961. Dep: 14/10/1961. | ||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64704 from Sunderland (52G) | ||
08/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |