|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 14/09/1928 | 01/11/1928 | 49 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 06/06/1930 | 25/07/1930 | 50 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 15/07/1931 | 24/07/1931 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 14/10/1931 | 21/10/1931 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 07/10/1932 | 01/12/1932 | 56 days | General | Steam Brakes fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 21/05/1935 | 01/07/1935 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 1907 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 19/01/1937 | 25/02/1937 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 1926 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/04/1939 | 17/05/1939 | 44 days | General | Tender only Boiler number BP133 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/04/1941 | 07/05/1941 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 2940 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/12/1942 | 23/01/1943 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/08/1943 | 18/09/1943 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 822 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 22/05/1944 | 01/07/1944 | 41 days | Heavy | Boiler number RS129 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 07/07/1945 | 04/08/1945 | 29 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/10/1946 | 25/01/1947 | 99 days | Heavy | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/12/1947 | 31/01/1948 | 34 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/04/1949 | 28/05/1949 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64705 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 14/09/1951 | 13/10/1951 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 27536 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gateshead Works | 19/03/1952 | 26/03/1952 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/02/1953 | 13/03/1953 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/01/1954 | 13/03/1954 | 47 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gateshead Works | 17/02/1955 | 24/02/1955 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/08/1956 | 27/10/1956 | 73 days | General | Boiler number 27652 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gateshead Works | 22/08/1957 | 11/10/1957 | 51 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/10/1959 | 05/11/1959 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/10/1926 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1454 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1340 Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
25/11/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
14/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1928. Dep: 01/11/1928. | ||
06/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1930. Dep: 25/07/1930. | ||
15/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/07/1931. Dep: 24/07/1931. | ||
14/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/10/1931. Dep: 21/10/1931. | ||
07/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1932. Dep: 01/12/1932. Work undertaken: Steam Brakes fitted |
||
21/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1935. Dep: 01/07/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1907 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
19/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1937. Dep: 25/02/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1926 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1939. Dep: 17/05/1939. Work undertaken: Tender only Boiler number BP133 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1941. Dep: 07/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2940 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/12/1942. Dep: 23/01/1943. | ||
28/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1943. Dep: 18/09/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 822 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 22/05/1944. Dep: 01/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number RS129 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1945. Dep: 04/08/1945. | ||
23/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4705 | ||
19/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 19/10/1946. Dep: 25/01/1947. | ||
29/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/12/1947. Dep: 31/01/1948. | ||
29/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/04/1949. Dep: 28/05/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64705 |
||
04/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
10/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
02/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
08/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
14/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1951. Dep: 13/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27536 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/03/1952. Dep: 26/03/1952. | ||
23/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/02/1953. Dep: 13/03/1953. | ||
26/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/01/1954. Dep: 13/03/1954. | ||
17/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/02/1955. Dep: 24/02/1955. | ||
16/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1956. Dep: 27/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27652 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Alnmouth (52d) | ||
22/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/08/1957. Dep: 11/10/1957. | ||
25/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
01/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/10/1959. Dep: 05/11/1959. | ||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
26/03/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
29/03/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64705 from Ardsley (56B) | ||
06/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |