|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 29/06/1929 | 26/07/1929 | 28 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 22/11/1930 | 31/12/1930 | 40 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 27/01/1932 | 20/02/1932 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 8012 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1934 | 14/04/1934 | 24 days | General | Sent to Gorton Boiler number 2145 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/07/1936 | 07/08/1936 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 8589 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 05/01/1939 | 28/01/1939 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2094 (Diagram 97) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/11/1941 | 13/12/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/07/1944 | 12/08/1944 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 2106 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/02/1945 | 03/03/1945 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 24/03/1947 | 12/04/1947 | 20 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 01/02/1949 | 26/02/1949 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 2674 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64725 |
||
Derby Works | 28/02/1951 | 30/03/1951 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27661 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 09/10/1953 | 08/12/1953 | 61 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/05/1954 | 12/06/1954 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/01/1956 | 10/03/1956 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 27542 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 30/05/1960 | 24/06/1960 | 26 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1951 | Derby Works | During February, un-renumbered engines in Works were 7665 (5C), 7453 (10E), 762 (15D), 4409 (17A), 7125 (18A), 3334 (19A), 3449 (20B), 3656 (20D), 3257, 4203/24 (21A), 7567 (25G). Engines received from other regions for attention were (30A) 64781, (32A) 64731, (32B) 64900, (33C) 42505/11, (35C) 44476, (37A) 64760, 64840, (E) 4907, (38A) 64716, 64965, (40A) 64725, 64886, (71G) 44560, (71H) 43194, (84J) 2183, (85B) 2144, (86B) 2033. Engines despatched to other regions after repair include (30A) 64783, (32A) 64802, (32B) 64905, (33A) 42328, (33C) 42506, (35C) 40482, 44518, (36A) 64910/67, (37A) 64751, 64836, 64911, (38A) 64832, (40A) 64730, (71G) 44560, (84G) 43679, (87K) 42385. No. 58246 (LMS.3175) has come off works still with round-topped fire-box. The following withdrawn engines were cut up in February: 22853, 41012, 41962, 762, 41824, 43811; while Nos. 41011, 41955/60/3-5/8 and Crane 58865 were in the yard. Stored, near station: 40411/6, 40632, 41000/60, 43200/59, 43361/70, 43429. No. 43226 is in for special examination, and may be condemned. At the end of the month, Nos. 407, 40418 an 40513, which have been in store for some time near the station, were returned to traffic. |
SLS/195104 |
13/09/1959 | Selby & Starbeck MPDs closed | The locomotive depots at Selby and Starbeck were closed as from 13/9/59. As a result, most of their locomotive allocation has been transferred to York (50A) viz. 47438/62, 47581, 61466/9, 62738/53/70, 63348, 63436/49, 64706/25, 64818/21/45/7/55/7/9/61/6, 64904/42/4, 68686, 69910/2, 77004/13. | SLS/195911 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/05/1927 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1265 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1360 Allocated to Immingham (IMM) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
13/10/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
29/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1929. Dep: 26/07/1929. | ||
22/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/11/1930. Dep: 31/12/1930. | ||
27/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1932. Dep: 20/02/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8012 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/08/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
01/09/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
26/09/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
16/10/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
22/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1934. Dep: 14/04/1934. Work undertaken: Sent to Gorton Boiler number 2145 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1936. Dep: 07/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8589 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
05/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1939. Dep: 28/01/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2094 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1941. Dep: 13/12/1941. | ||
13/12/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
18/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1944. Dep: 12/08/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2106 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/02/1945. Dep: 03/03/1945. | ||
30/09/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
30/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4725 | ||
24/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1947. Dep: 12/04/1947. | ||
17/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
01/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1949. Dep: 26/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2674 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64725 |
||
25/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
01/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
28/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1951. Dep: 30/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27661 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
09/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/10/1953. Dep: 08/12/1953. | ||
21/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/05/1954. Dep: 12/06/1954. | ||
10/10/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
24/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1956. Dep: 10/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27542 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
26/07/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
13/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
13/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
30/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/05/1960. Dep: 24/06/1960. | ||
22/10/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64725 from Thornaby (51L) | ||
01/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |