|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 16/01/1931 | 21/02/1931 | 37 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/10/1933 | 25/11/1933 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 8773 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/02/1936 | 26/03/1936 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 8594 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/09/1938 | 14/10/1938 | 24 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/08/1941 | 12/10/1941 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1944 | 09/09/1944 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 2110 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 07/12/1946 | 10/03/1947 | 94 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 24/11/1948 | 23/01/1949 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 2300 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64769 |
||
Gorton Works | 17/11/1949 | 04/02/1950 | 80 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 11/02/1950 | 12/02/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 27/06/1952 | 29/08/1952 | 64 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 24/11/1953 | 26/11/1953 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 16/06/1955 | 13/08/1955 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 27554 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/11/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2716 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1430 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
07/12/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
16/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1931. Dep: 21/02/1931. | ||
27/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1933. Dep: 25/11/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8773 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1936. Dep: 26/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8594 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1938. Dep: 14/10/1938. | ||
20/07/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (COL) | ||
03/08/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
24/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1941. Dep: 12/10/1941. | ||
30/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1944. Dep: 09/09/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2110 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4769 | ||
07/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1946. Dep: 10/03/1947. | ||
24/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1948. Dep: 23/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2300 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64769 |
||
17/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 17/11/1949. Dep: 04/02/1950. | ||
11/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/02/1950. Dep: 12/02/1950. | ||
27/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 27/06/1952. Dep: 29/08/1952. | ||
24/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/11/1953. Dep: 26/11/1953. | ||
16/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1955. Dep: 13/08/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27554 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/03/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
01/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
21/01/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64769 from March (31B) |