|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 26/06/1931 | 25/07/1931 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2223 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/01/1934 | 03/02/1934 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 2208 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/04/1936 | 16/05/1936 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 8026 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1939 | 22/04/1939 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2122 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 08/02/1942 | 01/05/1942 | 83 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 14/12/1942 | 16/01/1943 | 34 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 15/11/1944 | 09/12/1944 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 29/09/1945 | 15/12/1945 | 78 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 31/01/1948 | 25/03/1948 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 2193 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64780 |
||
Derby Works | 13/08/1951 | 23/10/1951 | 72 days | General | Boiler number 27678 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 16/09/1954 | 30/10/1954 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 2623 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 06/07/1956 | 26/07/1956 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 02/04/1957 | 10/05/1957 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2669 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/04/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2727 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1451 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
10/05/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
26/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1931. Dep: 25/07/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2223 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1934. Dep: 03/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2208 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1936. Dep: 16/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8026 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1939. Dep: 22/04/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2122 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1942. Dep: 01/05/1942. | ||
14/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/12/1942. Dep: 16/01/1943. | ||
15/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/11/1944. Dep: 09/12/1944. | ||
29/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1945. Dep: 15/12/1945. | ||
05/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4780 | ||
31/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1948. Dep: 25/03/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2193 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64780 |
||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
18/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
13/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1951. Dep: 23/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27678 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1954. Dep: 30/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2623 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/07/1956. Dep: 26/07/1956. | ||
02/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1957. Dep: 10/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2669 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/01/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64780 from Stratford (30A) | ||
04/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |