|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 13/04/1931 | 21/05/1931 | 39 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 20/11/1931 | 26/01/1932 | 68 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/10/1933 | 05/12/1933 | 36 days | General | Boiler number C1720 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 03/04/1935 | 13/05/1935 | 41 days | General | Boiler number C1719 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 29/06/1937 | 06/08/1937 | 39 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/12/1938 | 20/01/1939 | 32 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/08/1940 | 25/09/1940 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 4903 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 29/03/1941 | 16/04/1941 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/03/1942 | 05/03/1942 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/01/1943 | 09/02/1943 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 27481 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/03/1944 | 13/03/1944 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/03/1945 | 23/03/1945 | 20 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/06/1946 | 18/07/1946 | 26 days | Heavy | Boiler number BP133 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 10/07/1947 | 31/10/1947 | 114 days | General | |||
Derby Works | 16/08/1950 | 31/10/1950 | 77 days | General | Boiler number 2579 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64785 |
||
Stratford Works | 22/05/1953 | 25/07/1953 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 27785 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 11/01/1954 | 05/03/1954 | 54 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 05/04/1956 | 18/05/1956 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27782 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1950 | Derby Works | For works: 12000, 40012/51/8, 40353, 414, 40498, 40515, 527, 40567, 684, 40917/26/8, 41017/58/72/7/81, 41124/60/9, 41710, 1748, 41961, 42508/15, 3099, 43216/24, 3271, 43283, 3484, 43538, 3738/59/60, 43835/54/62, 43909/16/29/94, 44020/45/94/6, 44137, 44414/33/75, 44566, 47220, 7237, 47287, 7324, 47356, 7395, 7403/5/17/51, 47506, 7507,7542/81, 58033, 1406, 58080, 58224, W.2108 and 'J.39' 4721/37/85, 64980, 4956. Ex Works: 42146, UTA.57, 12070-3 (new): and after repair 40410, 40535/56, 40929, 41088, 41535, 41672, 41752, 41889, 42353, 42510, 43224, 43446, 43574, 43690, 44127/37/90, 44242, 44362, 44414/72, 44521, 47280, 47342/56/65, 47426, 47526, 58220/4/9, 64762/84/97, 64960 and 2097. New Construction, in various stages 2-6-4T 42050-4 (Order 4310) and D/E 12074/5 almost complete. Being cut up 41034, 58036 (24/8). The works yard contained 22853, 43818, 43297, 41017, 3511, 40515 (all condemned) and 58033, 1406, 40498 (under consideration). | SLS/195012 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/05/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2732 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1456 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
30/05/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
13/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1931. Dep: 21/05/1931. | ||
20/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/11/1931. Dep: 26/01/1932. | ||
31/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1933. Dep: 05/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1720 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1935. Dep: 13/05/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1719 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1937. Dep: 06/08/1937. | ||
20/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1938. Dep: 20/01/1939. | ||
20/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1940. Dep: 25/09/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4903 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/03/1941. Dep: 16/04/1941. | ||
03/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/03/1942. Dep: 05/03/1942. | ||
13/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1943. Dep: 09/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27481 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
01/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/03/1944. Dep: 13/03/1944. | ||
04/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1945. Dep: 23/03/1945. | ||
20/08/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
31/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4785 | ||
23/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 23/06/1946. Dep: 18/07/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number BP133 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
10/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1947. Dep: 31/10/1947. | ||
16/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1950. Dep: 31/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2579 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64785 |
||
22/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1953. Dep: 25/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27785 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/01/1954. Dep: 05/03/1954. | ||
05/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1956. Dep: 18/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27782 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/06/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64785 from Ipswich (32B) | ||
09/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |