|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 27/02/1931 | 01/05/1931 | 64 days | General | Boiler number C1717 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 19/05/1934 | General | Boiler number C1738 (Diagram 97) |
||||
Cowlairs Works | 28/11/1935 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 12/07/1937 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 13/03/1939 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 16/03/1939 | 1 day | General | Boiler number C1715 (Diagram 97) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 11/01/1941 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 09/08/1941 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 11/08/1942 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 23/07/1943 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 28/09/1944 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 02/12/1944 | 1 day | General | Boiler number 27521 (Diagram 97) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 13/10/1945 | 27/10/1945 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/11/1946 | 23/11/1946 | 20 days | Heavy | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/11/1947 | 13/12/1947 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/06/1948 | 08/07/1948 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/06/1949 | 09/07/1949 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2601 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 15/08/1951 | 07/09/1951 | 24 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/06/1954 | 03/07/1954 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 27521 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 14/07/1954 | 1 day | Unclassified | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 02/10/1957 | 24/10/1957 | 23 days | Heavy Intermediate | W.P.U. gear removed |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/02/1961 | 25/03/1961 | 30 days | General | A.W.S. fitted Boiler number 27527 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
09/07/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 1221, 61245, 61308, 1726/32, 61772/89, 61936, 2461/81/90, 2689, 62692, 63177, 4541, 64567, 4591, 64625, 4706, 64790, 4864, 64915, 5925/31, 67475/78, 8120, 8338/40, 68499, 8551, 9129/32, 69144, 9157/66/92, 70802, 77442, ex L.M.S. Nos. 45086, 7162, 54651. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. | SLS/194908 |
14/04/1963 | Eastfield MPD (waiting Works) | 61008 transferred from LMR, ex Works-65916/32, and waiting Works-44194, 45713/24, 57653, 61147/80/346, 64527, 64790/814/44/69/97/910/24/9, 90060 an 90759. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/06/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2737 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1461 Allocated to St Margarets (STM) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
27/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1931. Dep: 01/05/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1717 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Dep: 19/05/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1738 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1935. | ||
12/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1937. | ||
13/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/03/1939. | ||
16/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1715 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1941. | ||
09/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/08/1941. | ||
11/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/08/1942. | ||
23/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1943. | ||
28/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/09/1944. | ||
02/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27521 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/08/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
13/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/10/1945. Dep: 27/10/1945. | ||
07/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4790 | ||
04/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 04/11/1946. Dep: 23/11/1946. | ||
28/09/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
29/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/11/1947. Dep: 13/12/1947. | ||
28/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/06/1948. Dep: 08/07/1948. | ||
10/07/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 64790 | ||
06/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1949. Dep: 09/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2601 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/08/1951. Dep: 07/09/1951. | ||
08/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1954. Dep: 03/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27521 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/07/1954. | ||
02/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/10/1957. Dep: 24/10/1957. Work undertaken: W.P.U. gear removed |
||
17/08/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
24/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1961. Dep: 25/03/1961. Work undertaken: A.W.S. fitted Boiler number 27527 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64790 from Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
04/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |