|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 25/02/1931 | 30/04/1931 | 65 days | General | Boiler number C1715 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/06/1933 | 15/07/1933 | 25 days | General | Boiler number C1713 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 08/09/1934 | 1 day | General | Boiler number 27469 (Diagram 97) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 06/02/1936 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 10/10/1937 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 08/09/1938 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 02/12/1939 | 1 day | General | Boiler number C1713 (Diagram 97) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 06/04/1940 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 01/02/1941 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 18/04/1942 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 04/12/1943 | 18/12/1943 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 27550 (Diagram 97) |
||
Inverurie Works | 19/04/1945 | 26/05/1945 | 38 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/10/1945 | 03/11/1945 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/04/1947 | 18/04/1947 | 15 days | Heavy | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/10/1949 | 24/11/1949 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27534 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64792 |
||
Inverurie Works | 10/10/1951 | 01/11/1951 | 23 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 25/03/1955 | 09/04/1955 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 27544 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 13/04/1955 | 14/04/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/02/1958 | 15/03/1958 | 26 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/10/1958 | 04/10/1958 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/04/1959 | 30/04/1959 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/03/1960 | 26/03/1960 | 13 days | C/I-I | Boiler number 27556 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 11/05/1960 | 19/05/1960 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/10/1960 | 06/01/1961 | 75 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 61219, 61779/81, 61855, 1900, 62432/78, 2484, 3071, 3134/47/75/84, 4565, 64578, 4639, 4711/92, 4816, 64849, 4927, 65929/31, 7484/95, 8332/48, 68456, 69130, 9165, 69199, 9216, 69514, 9562, 77119, 79265. | SLS/194912 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/07/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2739 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1463 Allocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
25/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1931. Dep: 30/04/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1715 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1933. Dep: 15/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1713 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27469 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
06/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1936. | ||
10/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1937. | ||
08/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/09/1938. | ||
02/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1713 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/04/1940. | ||
08/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmont (POL) | ||
01/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/02/1941. | ||
18/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1942. | ||
18/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
04/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1943. Dep: 18/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27550 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/04/1945. Dep: 26/05/1945. | ||
20/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/10/1945. Dep: 03/11/1945. | ||
24/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4792 | ||
04/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 04/04/1947. Dep: 18/04/1947. | ||
18/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1949. Dep: 24/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27534 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64792 |
||
10/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 10/10/1951. Dep: 01/11/1951. | ||
25/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1955. Dep: 09/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27544 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/04/1955. Dep: 14/04/1955. | ||
18/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/02/1958. Dep: 15/03/1958. | ||
02/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/10/1958. Dep: 04/10/1958. | ||
28/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/04/1959. Dep: 30/04/1959. | ||
17/08/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
14/03/1960 | Works Visit | |||
11/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/05/1960. Dep: 19/05/1960. | ||
24/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/10/1960. Dep: 06/01/1961. | ||
04/01/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64792 from Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
06/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |