|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 02/09/1930 | 11/10/1930 | 40 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/03/1932 | 22/04/1932 | 38 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/01/1934 | 28/02/1934 | 41 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/08/1934 | 04/09/1934 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/11/1934 | 15/11/1934 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/10/1935 | 18/11/1935 | 42 days | General | Boiler number C1720 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 17/08/1937 | 08/09/1937 | 23 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/02/1940 | 16/03/1940 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27469 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 11/06/1940 | 14/06/1940 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/08/1940 | 15/08/1940 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/07/1941 | 02/08/1941 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/02/1943 | 18/03/1943 | 30 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/07/1944 | 11/07/1944 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/06/1945 | 10/07/1945 | 21 days | General | Boiler number 822 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/08/1945 | 27/08/1945 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/10/1946 | 23/10/1946 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/01/1947 | 1 day | Unclassified | Spark arrestor fitted |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 19/03/1947 | 22/03/1947 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 14/03/1948 | 17/05/1948 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 4914 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64793 |
||
Gorton Works | 21/10/1948 | 27/11/1948 | 38 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 28/01/1949 | 18/02/1949 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Derby Works | 20/11/1950 | 24/01/1951 | 66 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Stratford Works | 10/03/1953 | 25/06/1953 | 108 days | General | Boiler number 27782 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 22/04/1954 | 30/06/1954 | 70 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 08/01/1956 | 15/02/1956 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27772 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 15/05/1957 | 28/05/1957 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 17/10/1958 | 23/10/1958 | 7 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1950 | Derby Works | In addition to the normal types of L.M.S. origin, the following have come off works: 2060, 2107, 12011, 64749/82, 64807/34, 64958/9. Withdrawn engines in works yard: 3802, 20155, 22853, 58061. No. 20155 has had the number freshly painted on the smokebox door, and neatly enclosed in a white-painted rectangle. Buffer beam repainted, but boiler casing removed. Engines in for repair 2053 (82D), 12012 (8C), 12002 (5B), 64841 (32B), 64893 (36A), 64971 (40A), 64727 (9F), (6)4910 (36A), 64734 (40A), 64793 (32B), 64805 (39A), 42387/8 (87K); 7316 (71G); and the following other un-renumbered engines 7583 (26B), 2995 (18B), 524 (7B), 4294 (18A), 7131 (21A), 7298 (4A), 7300 (33A), 32 (14B); also numerous others of L.M.S. origin. Position as regards new construction on 30/11/50:-42062/3 almost complete; 42064/5 commenced; 12084/5 in paint shop, 12086 completed. Early in December another diesel, 12087 had the engines mounted, and the frames of 73000 were in the erecting shop. Among engines entering works were 509 (71G), 2988 (15B), 3827 (18A), 7503 (11C), 64802 (32A), 64979 (37A). Nos. 509, 43319 an 3827 were 'for special examination' and may not survive the ordeal. |
SLS/195101 |
31/01/1951 | Derby Works | During the second half of January new construction comprised some work on Nos. 73000/1, the cylinders of the former being positioned. No. 10100 has been outside the diesel shop for some days. Condemned locos. in the Works yard: 40370, 41012, 41824 (from W.R.), also the N.L. Crane 58865. No. 22853 was still in Works, not cut up, on 26/1. In store near the station: 43429 (17C), and 407, 40418, 40513, 40632, 43200/59, 43361 (17A), all 17A. Engines from other Regions under repair: 42328, 42506/23, 58043 (33A), 42394 (87K), 44518 (35C), 64728 (40A), 64751, 64911 (37A), 64987 (36C). Most engines now leave shops with the B.R. emblem, but 42371 an 47473 have come off lettered BRITISH RAILWAYS, while tenders so lettered are attached to 43757, 44576 an 58265. Engines off shops with tanks or tenders lettered L.M.S. are 42335, 41101, 43395, 44002/15: apparently Derby has a lingering affection for this lettering, which became obsolete three years ago!! W2043 has come off without emblem, but with W prefix under the numberplate. No. 58071, lined with emblem, is freshly out still with round-topped firebox. Several J.39 class have come off shops, 64793, 64910/79 (repainted with emblem) and 64714 (renumbered-with emblem-but not repainted). Un-renumbered engines in shops include 326 (20A), 580 (27D), 7295 (12A), 7339 (11A), 7391 (12A). No. 326 is the last of the S. & D.J. engines to get its B.R. number, which will be its fourth: originally No. 69, it became 43 in 1928, and 326 in March 1930. Latterly it has been working in the Leeds area. | SLS/195103 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/07/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2740 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1464 Allocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
02/09/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1930. Dep: 11/10/1930. | ||
11/11/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
16/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1932. Dep: 22/04/1932. | ||
01/02/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
19/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1934. Dep: 28/02/1934. | ||
31/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/08/1934. Dep: 04/09/1934. | ||
06/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/11/1934. Dep: 15/11/1934. | ||
08/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1935. Dep: 18/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1720 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1937. Dep: 08/09/1937. | ||
02/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1940. Dep: 16/03/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27469 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/06/1940. Dep: 14/06/1940. | ||
14/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/08/1940. Dep: 15/08/1940. | ||
05/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/07/1941. Dep: 02/08/1941. | ||
17/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1943. Dep: 18/03/1943. | ||
05/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/07/1944. Dep: 11/07/1944. | ||
20/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1945. Dep: 10/07/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 822 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/08/1945. Dep: 27/08/1945. | ||
07/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4793 | ||
03/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/10/1946. Dep: 23/10/1946. | ||
23/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/01/1947. Work undertaken: Spark arrestor fitted |
||
19/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/03/1947. Dep: 22/03/1947. | ||
01/05/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
14/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1948. Dep: 17/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4914 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64793 |
||
21/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/10/1948. Dep: 27/11/1948. | ||
28/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/01/1949. Dep: 18/02/1949. | ||
20/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/11/1950. Dep: 24/01/1951. | ||
10/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1953. Dep: 25/06/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27782 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/04/1954. Dep: 30/06/1954. | ||
08/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1956. Dep: 15/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27772 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/05/1957. Dep: 28/05/1957. | ||
17/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/10/1958. Dep: 23/10/1958. | ||
26/11/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64793 from Ipswich (32B) | ||
12/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |