|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 20/11/1931 | 26/12/1931 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 2287 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/10/1934 | 17/11/1934 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 2193 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/06/1937 | 26/06/1937 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 8023 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/01/1938 | 28/01/1938 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 01/08/1938 | 13/08/1938 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 2136 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/01/1942 | 21/02/1942 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 27730 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/04/1944 | 17/06/1944 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 2667 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 31/03/1946 | 03/08/1946 | 126 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 26/08/1946 | 14/09/1946 | 20 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4796 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/06/1948 | 21/08/1948 | 70 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1949 | 26/11/1949 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 2291 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/12/1949 | 21/12/1949 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 24/02/1950 | 22/04/1950 | 58 days | Light Casual | |||
Derby Works | 07/04/1951 | 06/07/1951 | 91 days | General | Boiler number 27669 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/11/1953 | 31/12/1953 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 25806 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/01/1954 | 09/01/1954 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 25/10/1956 | 01/12/1956 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27832 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/09/1958 | 22/11/1958 | 66 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 13/09/1960 | 29/10/1960 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 27844 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/11/1960 | 22/11/1960 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 20/09/1961 | 29/09/1961 | 10 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
05/05/1951 | Derby Works | On 5th May, 73002 was complete in Works, 73003 almost finished, 73004 boiler in position, 73005 frames only. By 22nd May, 73004 complete, 73005/6 frames only. Diesels, on the same date, were 12088 complete, 12089 almost so, 12090/1 frames only. In works yard were 40470, 41006. Other regions' engines in works were : 64744 (39A), 64796, 64801 (37A), 64887 (40A) and 0-6-0PT 2088. | SLS/195107 |
14/07/1951 | Derby Works | During the first half of July new 5MT 73000/5/6/7 went back into works for modification to drawgear; others were laid down up to 73012, also frames of diesel 12094. Into shops: 2159 (86G), 40011, 40472, 40508, 40629, 681, 40925, 41044, 41079, 41803/13, 41901, 42141, 42218 (33A), 42323, 42390 (87K), 43235/90, 43631, 43792 (71H), 43987, 44039, 44162, 44467, 44589, 45183 (84G), 47353, 47440/6, 47585, M7603, 47607, 58077, 22951, 64712/55 (39A), 64768 (30A). 40508, 41044 and 58077 were in for special examination. Where sheds are quoted, the locos. are other than L.M.R. stock. In works yard (withdrawn): 1781, 1856, 3617 (58296), 58237, 58302. Stored near station: 40411/6/26, 43312/68, 43469/96, 43574, 58163. Off works: 12015, 40012, 40396, 40402/44/86, 40583, 40935, 41078/87, 42141, 42218, 42317/84, 42411, 42525, 43218, 43331, 43787, 43907/76, 44102/23/34, 44268, 47266, 47357, 47547/89/95, 47611, 53810, 58040, 58300, 64796, 64887. Of these 40583, 42525:43907, 47357 and 53810 are still lettered L.M.S, and 40396 now has tall Stanier chimney in place of previous L.M.S. lipped pattern. | SLS/195109 |
10/03/1963 | Ardsley MPD (Stored) | Stored at Ardsley on 10th March-60036/69/70/7/80/92/125, 61068/310, 64719/49/54/6/60/96/859/79/86/911/8/69, 67742/63/5/6/77. | SLS/196304 |
01/04/1963 | Washingborough Junction (Stored) | The Washingborough Junc.- Pelham St. Junc, section of the Boston-Lincoln line has been taken out of use; trains now use the former avoiding line from Washingborough Junc. (s.b. now closed) to Greetwell Junc. and the GN/GE Joint line thence to Lincoln Central. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/08/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2770 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1467 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
07/09/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
21/09/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
20/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1931. Dep: 26/12/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2287 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1934. Dep: 17/11/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2193 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/01/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
09/02/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
01/02/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
01/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1937. Dep: 26/06/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8023 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/01/1938. Dep: 28/01/1938. | ||
01/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1938. Dep: 13/08/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2136 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1942. Dep: 21/02/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27730 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1944. Dep: 17/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2667 (Diagram 97) |
||
31/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1946. Dep: 03/08/1946. | ||
26/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/08/1946. Dep: 14/09/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4796 |
||
13/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/06/1948. Dep: 21/08/1948. | ||
25/12/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 64796 | ||
22/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1949. Dep: 26/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2291 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/12/1949. Dep: 21/12/1949. | ||
24/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/02/1950. Dep: 22/04/1950. | ||
07/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1951. Dep: 06/07/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27669 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1953. Dep: 31/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25806 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/01/1954. Dep: 09/01/1954. | ||
25/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1956. Dep: 01/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27832 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) | ||
12/01/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
18/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/09/1958. Dep: 22/11/1958. | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
13/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1960. Dep: 29/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27844 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/11/1960. Dep: 22/11/1960. | ||
20/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/09/1961. Dep: 29/09/1961. | ||
13/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64796 from Ardsley (56B) | ||
09/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |