|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 17/10/1932 | 11/11/1932 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 8024 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/01/1935 | 08/02/1935 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 8004 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/12/1936 | 26/12/1936 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 2290 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/03/1938 | 26/03/1938 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 2301 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/08/1939 | 28/10/1939 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 2579 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 17/12/1941 | 29/03/1942 | 103 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 01/12/1942 | 17/04/1943 | 138 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 06/08/1944 | 07/10/1944 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 2208 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/08/1946 | 08/02/1947 | 174 days | General | Boiler number 3170 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4807 |
||
Gorton Works | 10/03/1947 | 15/03/1947 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 30/09/1948 | 11/12/1948 | 73 days | General | Boiler number 2103 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64807 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/07/1949 | 19/08/1949 | 39 days | Light Casual | |||
Derby Works | 18/09/1950 | 23/11/1950 | 67 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Derby Works | 30/07/1952 | 19/09/1952 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 27719 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 20/07/1954 | 27/08/1954 | 39 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 29/09/1955 | 04/11/1955 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27848 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 04/11/1957 | 10/01/1958 | 68 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/10/1950 | Derby Works | For Works: W/E 7/10/50:-50 1A, 40332 5A, 40478 16A, 41165 2A, 41181 9E, 1186 26C, 41187 27A, 41686 16A, 42362 9A, 42395 11B, 43795 18A, 43992 18B, 44175 22B, 44400 20E, 7674 6C, 53803 22C, 58059 15D, (6)4782 30A, 64807 38A. Ex Works: 41050, 43435, 64737, 43456, 44180, 58090, 58237. | SLS/195012 |
30/11/1950 | Derby Works | In addition to the normal types of L.M.S. origin, the following have come off works: 2060, 2107, 12011, 64749/82, 64807/34, 64958/9. Withdrawn engines in works yard: 3802, 20155, 22853, 58061. No. 20155 has had the number freshly painted on the smokebox door, and neatly enclosed in a white-painted rectangle. Buffer beam repainted, but boiler casing removed. Engines in for repair 2053 (82D), 12012 (8C), 12002 (5B), 64841 (32B), 64893 (36A), 64971 (40A), 64727 (9F), (6)4910 (36A), 64734 (40A), 64793 (32B), 64805 (39A), 42387/8 (87K); 7316 (71G); and the following other un-renumbered engines 7583 (26B), 2995 (18B), 524 (7B), 4294 (18A), 7131 (21A), 7298 (4A), 7300 (33A), 32 (14B); also numerous others of L.M.S. origin. Position as regards new construction on 30/11/50:-42062/3 almost complete; 42064/5 commenced; 12084/5 in paint shop, 12086 completed. Early in December another diesel, 12087 had the engines mounted, and the frames of 73000 were in the erecting shop. Among engines entering works were 509 (71G), 2988 (15B), 3827 (18A), 7503 (11C), 64802 (32A), 64979 (37A). Nos. 509, 43319 an 3827 were 'for special examination' and may not survive the ordeal. |
SLS/195101 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/11/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2781 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1478 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
15/11/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
19/11/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
17/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1932. Dep: 11/11/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8024 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1935. Dep: 08/02/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8004 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1936. Dep: 26/12/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2290 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1938. Dep: 26/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2301 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1939. Dep: 28/10/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2579 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1941. Dep: 29/03/1942. | ||
01/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1942. Dep: 17/04/1943. | ||
09/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
03/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
06/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1944. Dep: 07/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2208 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1946. Dep: 08/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3170 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4807 |
||
10/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/03/1947. Dep: 15/03/1947. | ||
30/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1948. Dep: 11/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2103 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64807 |
||
12/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/07/1949. Dep: 19/08/1949. | ||
14/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
18/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/09/1950. Dep: 23/11/1950. | ||
30/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1952. Dep: 19/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27719 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
20/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/07/1954. Dep: 27/08/1954. | ||
16/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
29/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1955. Dep: 04/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27848 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/11/1957. Dep: 10/01/1958. | ||
07/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
04/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
05/04/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64807 from Sheffield Darnall (41A) |