|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 29/10/1931 | 05/12/1931 | 38 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 20/02/1934 | 15/03/1934 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2301 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/12/1935 | 25/01/1936 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 2214 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/03/1938 | 26/04/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2290 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1940 | 04/05/1940 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2301 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/11/1943 | 15/01/1944 | 69 days | General | Boiler number 2203 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/02/1944 | 09/02/1944 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 07/10/1946 | 16/04/1947 | 192 days | General | Boiler number 2287 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/04/1947 | 16/05/1947 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 28/10/1949 | 24/12/1949 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 27702 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64809 |
||
Gorton Works | 29/12/1949 | 30/12/1949 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 02/01/1950 | 21/01/1950 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 24/10/1952 | 27/11/1952 | 35 days | Hfl | |||
Gorton Works | 18/12/1954 | 22/01/1955 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 27764 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/09/1957 | 26/10/1957 | 29 days | General | Not repaired Boiler number 27839 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/11/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2783 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1480 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
21/11/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
29/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1931. Dep: 05/12/1931. | ||
20/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1934. Dep: 15/03/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2301 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1935. Dep: 25/01/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2214 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/04/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
06/07/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
29/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1938. Dep: 26/04/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2290 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/06/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
12/08/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
22/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1940. Dep: 04/05/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2301 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1943. Dep: 15/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2203 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/02/1944. Dep: 09/02/1944. | ||
06/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4809 | ||
07/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1946. Dep: 16/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2287 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/04/1947. Dep: 16/05/1947. | ||
28/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1949. Dep: 24/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27702 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64809 |
||
29/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/12/1949. Dep: 30/12/1949. | ||
02/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/01/1950. Dep: 21/01/1950. | ||
24/10/1952 | Works Visit | |||
18/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1954. Dep: 22/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27764 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1957. Dep: 26/10/1957. Work undertaken: Not repaired Boiler number 27839 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
01/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
27/01/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64809 from Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
02/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |