|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 19/02/1932 | 12/03/1932 | 23 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 12/02/1934 | 03/03/1934 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 8584 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/01/1936 | 15/02/1936 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2301 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/02/1938 | 12/03/1938 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 824 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/07/1940 | 31/08/1940 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 8773 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/02/1942 | 18/04/1942 | 76 days | General | Boiler number RS118 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/05/1942 | 15/05/1942 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 06/06/1944 | 29/07/1944 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 2771 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/01/1946 | 02/03/1946 | 55 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 13/12/1946 | 28/05/1947 | 167 days | General | Boiler number 3176 (Diagram 97) |
||
Derby Works | 10/10/1951 | 20/11/1951 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 27681 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64810 |
||
Derby Works | 28/02/1952 | 22/03/1952 | 24 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 04/07/1953 | 06/07/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 28/06/1954 | 21/08/1954 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 27670 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/08/1954 | 28/08/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 23/10/1957 | 07/12/1957 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 25810 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 24/02/1959 | 10/03/1959 | 15 days | Unclassified | Tender change |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/11/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2784 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1482 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
05/12/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
19/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1932. Dep: 12/03/1932. | ||
12/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1934. Dep: 03/03/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8584 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1936. Dep: 15/02/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2301 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/06/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
01/09/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
11/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1938. Dep: 12/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 824 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1940. Dep: 31/08/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8773 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1942. Dep: 18/04/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number RS118 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/05/1942. Dep: 15/05/1942. | ||
06/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1944. Dep: 29/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2771 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/01/1946. Dep: 02/03/1946. | ||
24/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
24/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4810 | ||
13/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1946. Dep: 28/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3176 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/05/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
10/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1951. Dep: 20/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27681 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64810 |
||
28/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/02/1952. Dep: 22/03/1952. | ||
04/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/07/1953. Dep: 06/07/1953. | ||
28/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1954. Dep: 21/08/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27670 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/08/1954. Dep: 28/08/1954. | ||
29/08/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
17/10/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
20/03/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
27/11/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
23/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1957. Dep: 07/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25810 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/02/1959. Dep: 10/03/1959. Work undertaken: Tender change |
||
25/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
26/06/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64810 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
07/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |