|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 03/02/1932 | 05/03/1932 | 32 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 29/03/1934 | 21/04/1934 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2146 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/04/1936 | 09/05/1936 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 2184 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/07/1938 | 06/08/1938 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 2121 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/08/1938 | 23/08/1938 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 29/09/1940 | 16/11/1940 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 8007 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 21/12/1942 | 18/08/1943 | 241 days | General | Boiler number 8012 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 01/07/1945 | 08/09/1945 | 70 days | General | Boiler number 2772 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 14/09/1947 | 31/12/1947 | 109 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 27/05/1949 | 13/08/1949 | 79 days | General | Boiler number 4974 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64833 |
||
Derby Works | 21/02/1952 | 03/04/1952 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 27693 (Diagram 97) |
||
Derby Works | 10/04/1952 | 01/05/1952 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 06/07/1952 | 08/08/1952 | 34 days | Light Casual | |||
Derby Works | 12/08/1952 | 22/08/1952 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 19/03/1955 | 28/04/1955 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27836 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/05/1955 | 22/06/1955 | 31 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 06/05/1958 | 14/06/1958 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27515 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/03/1961 | 15/05/1961 | 49 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/01/1932 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2972 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1541 Allocated to March (MAR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
03/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/02/1932. Dep: 05/03/1932. | ||
29/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1934. Dep: 21/04/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2146 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1936. Dep: 09/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2184 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1938. Dep: 06/08/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2121 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/08/1938. Dep: 23/08/1938. | ||
29/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1940. Dep: 16/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8007 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1942. Dep: 18/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8012 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
01/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1945. Dep: 08/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2772 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4833 | ||
08/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (YAR) | ||
27/12/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
14/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1947. Dep: 31/12/1947. | ||
27/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1949. Dep: 13/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4974 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64833 |
||
21/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
21/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1952. Dep: 03/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27693 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/04/1952. Dep: 01/05/1952. | ||
06/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/07/1952. Dep: 08/08/1952. | ||
12/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/08/1952. Dep: 22/08/1952. | ||
21/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) | ||
13/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
27/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
19/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1955. Dep: 28/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27836 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/05/1955. Dep: 22/06/1955. | ||
06/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1958. Dep: 14/06/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27515 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/05/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
13/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
28/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/03/1961. Dep: 15/05/1961. | ||
26/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64833 from Sunderland (52G) | ||
08/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |