|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 03/06/1932 | 10/06/1932 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/07/1934 | 24/08/1934 | 29 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 30/07/1936 | 28/08/1936 | 30 days | General | Boiler number C1716 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 15/03/1937 | 17/03/1937 | 3 days | Unclassified | Tender only |
||
Cowlairs Works | 25/01/1938 | 16/03/1938 | 51 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/03/1940 | 11/04/1940 | 24 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/08/1940 | 17/08/1940 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/10/1941 | 03/11/1941 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27532 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 02/06/1942 | 04/06/1942 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/05/1943 | 29/05/1943 | 23 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/10/1944 | 31/10/1944 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/10/1946 | 30/11/1946 | 55 days | General | W.P.U. off 5/47 Boiler number 2116 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4838 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1949 | 03/12/1949 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 4903 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64838 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/12/1949 | 09/12/1949 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 28/04/1951 | 19/06/1951 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 27668 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 15/11/1953 | 19/12/1953 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 27879 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/06/1956 | 11/08/1956 | 67 days | General | Boiler number 27744 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/05/1932 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2977 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1551 Allocated to Eastfield (EFD) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
03/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/06/1932. Dep: 10/06/1932. | ||
27/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1934. Dep: 24/08/1934. | ||
30/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1936. Dep: 28/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1716 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/03/1937. Dep: 17/03/1937. Work undertaken: Tender only |
||
25/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1938. Dep: 16/03/1938. | ||
19/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1940. Dep: 11/04/1940. | ||
16/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/08/1940. Dep: 17/08/1940. | ||
03/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1941. Dep: 03/11/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27532 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/06/1942. Dep: 04/06/1942. | ||
13/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
07/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1943. Dep: 29/05/1943. | ||
12/12/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
26/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/10/1944. Dep: 31/10/1944. | ||
07/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1946. Dep: 30/11/1946. Work undertaken: W.P.U. off 5/47 Boiler number 2116 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4838 |
||
24/03/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
20/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
13/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1949. Dep: 03/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4903 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64838 |
||
08/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/12/1949. Dep: 09/12/1949. | ||
16/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
08/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
28/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1951. Dep: 19/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27668 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
15/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1953. Dep: 19/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27879 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
20/03/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
06/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1956. Dep: 11/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27744 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/01/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64838 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
28/02/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |