|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 19/01/1937 | 16/02/1937 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2579 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/02/1937 | 18/02/1937 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 12/09/1939 | 07/10/1939 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 2623 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/06/1940 | 05/07/1940 | 25 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/06/1941 | 12/08/1941 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27482 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/01/1943 | 03/02/1943 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 8580 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 14/08/1944 | 09/09/1944 | 27 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 23/03/1946 | 25/05/1946 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 8009 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/04/1948 | 29/05/1948 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 27526 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64853 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 16/11/1951 | 08/12/1951 | 23 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/07/1954 | 21/08/1954 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 1907 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 08/08/1957 | 31/08/1957 | 24 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/03/1960 | 25/05/1960 | 79 days | General | Boiler number 27431 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
14/12/1934 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1488 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1607 Allocated to Ferryhill (Co. Durham) (FER) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
19/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1937. Dep: 16/02/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2579 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/02/1937. Dep: 18/02/1937. | ||
24/08/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
12/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1939. Dep: 07/10/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2623 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/06/1940. Dep: 05/07/1940. | ||
30/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1941. Dep: 12/08/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27482 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1943. Dep: 03/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8580 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1944. Dep: 09/09/1944. | ||
23/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1946. Dep: 25/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8009 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4853 | ||
06/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1948. Dep: 29/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27526 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64853 |
||
18/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
24/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
16/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 16/11/1951. Dep: 08/12/1951. | ||
18/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
08/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1954. Dep: 21/08/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1907 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/08/1957. Dep: 31/08/1957. | ||
13/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
08/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1960. Dep: 25/05/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27431 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/07/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
20/08/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64853 from Sunderland (52G) | ||
06/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |