|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 25/01/1937 | 25/02/1937 | 32 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1939 | 29/06/1939 | 36 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 16/06/1941 | 29/07/1941 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2116 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 05/04/1944 | 13/05/1944 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 3191 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 25/01/1947 | 03/05/1947 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 2607 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gateshead Works | 02/11/1948 | 12/11/1948 | 11 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 64869 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/02/1949 | 23/04/1949 | 60 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 31/08/1949 | 07/10/1949 | 38 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/08/1951 | 15/09/1951 | 23 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gateshead Works | 26/11/1951 | 29/11/1951 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/03/1952 | 02/04/1952 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 16/04/1952 | 18/04/1952 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 16/09/1953 | 29/09/1953 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/09/1955 | 08/10/1955 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2716 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 22/07/1960 | 03/09/1960 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 25813 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/04/1963 | Eastfield MPD (waiting Works) | 61008 transferred from LMR, ex Works-65916/32, and waiting Works-44194, 45713/24, 57653, 61147/80/346, 64527, 64790/814/44/69/97/910/24/9, 90060 an 90759. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/12/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1505 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1655 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
25/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1937. Dep: 25/02/1937. | ||
25/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1939. Dep: 29/06/1939. | ||
16/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1941. Dep: 29/07/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2116 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
05/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1944. Dep: 13/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3191 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4869 | ||
25/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1947. Dep: 03/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2607 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/11/1948. Dep: 12/11/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64869 |
||
14/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
20/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
23/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1949. Dep: 23/04/1949. | ||
31/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/08/1949. Dep: 07/10/1949. | ||
09/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
24/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/08/1951. Dep: 15/09/1951. | ||
26/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/11/1951. Dep: 29/11/1951. | ||
13/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/03/1952. Dep: 02/04/1952. | ||
16/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/04/1952. Dep: 18/04/1952. | ||
16/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/09/1953. Dep: 29/09/1953. | ||
01/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1955. Dep: 08/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2716 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1960. Dep: 03/09/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25813 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/10/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
08/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Alnmouth (52d) | ||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64869 from Alnmouth (52D.1) | ||
05/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |