|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 13/01/1938 | 11/02/1938 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2660 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1940 | 07/12/1940 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 2684 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 25/06/1943 | 26/08/1943 | 63 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 10/02/1946 | 03/04/1946 | 53 days | General | Boiler number C7963 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/06/1949 | 27/08/1949 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 27711 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64874 |
||
Gorton Works | 27/04/1950 | 22/07/1950 | 87 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Derby Works | 11/06/1952 | 05/08/1952 | 56 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Derby Works | 15/08/1952 | 02/09/1952 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 22/10/1953 | 07/11/1953 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 10/11/1954 | 24/12/1954 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 2102 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 14/12/1955 | 28/02/1956 | 77 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 04/11/1957 | 07/12/1957 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 25828 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
23/04/1961 | Doncaster Works (Scrap Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2390/1, D3452, E3056/61-5. Stripping Road: D2402, D3152, D3487, 60033/8/9/64/83/8/95/8, 61814/49, 62049, 68945/90, 70010/35. Scrap Road: 64208/23/36, 64804/74/82, 68903/16/27/70/81, Crimpsall: 43149, 61384, 70001. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60143, 70053, 73012. Erecting Shop: D3445/89, D5573, D8217, 13252, 13326, 43126/44, 60020/40/63/8/75/90, 60126, 60520/8, 61162, 61205/11, 61363, 61897, 62025/42/60, 63985. Outside Erecting Shop: 60015, 61927, 62011. Paint Shop: D341, D2389, D5695, E3059/60, 60047/67, 60141, 60536, 61094, 73065. Works Shunters: DEPT10, DEPT11. | SLS/196106 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/06/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2943 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1619 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
30/08/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
13/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1938. Dep: 11/02/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2660 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1940. Dep: 07/12/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2684 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1943. Dep: 26/08/1943. | ||
10/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1946. Dep: 03/04/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number C7963 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4874 | ||
24/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1949. Dep: 27/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27711 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64874 |
||
27/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 27/04/1950. Dep: 22/07/1950. | ||
24/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
30/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
11/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/06/1952. Dep: 05/08/1952. | ||
15/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/08/1952. Dep: 02/09/1952. | ||
22/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/10/1953. Dep: 07/11/1953. | ||
10/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1954. Dep: 24/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2102 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/12/1955. Dep: 28/02/1956. | ||
28/10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
14/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
04/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1957. Dep: 07/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25828 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
01/03/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
17/04/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64874 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
05/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |