|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 11/02/1938 | 24/02/1938 | 14 days | General | Boiler number 2666 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/06/1940 | 10/06/1940 | 10 days | General | Boiler number 2273 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 22/06/1942 | 04/07/1942 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 8581 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/03/1945 | 21/04/1945 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 2302 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 05/03/1948 | 16/04/1948 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 27527 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64877 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 28/01/1950 | 24/02/1950 | 28 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/09/1951 | 02/10/1951 | 26 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/08/1953 | 23/08/1953 | 21 days | General | Boiler number 27487 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/11/1955 | 10/12/1955 | 18 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/12/1955 | 17/12/1955 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/10/1957 | 09/11/1957 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27635 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/11/1957 | 21/11/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/10/1959 | 28/11/1959 | 37 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 60152, 61072, 61117/18, 61307, 1751, 61764, 1780, 61784, 2474/76/88, 2684/94, 62733, 3058, 3168, 64575, 4586, 64621/28/36, 4786, 64877/80, 4919/40, 65923, 5924, 65932, 7453/80, 68100, 8323/44, 9170, 9214, 9507, 69595, 90505, ex-W.D. 77089, 77231, 73792. | SLS/195003 |
17/03/1963 | Carlisle Canal MPD (Stored) | Stored at Carlisle Canal-42067/98, 42449, 42720/52/5, 42835/6, 43045/139, 47520, 61064, 64499, 64877/8/95/9, 65237 an 69155. | SLS/196304 |
29/04/1963 | Coventry (Stored) | On 29th April a Cathedral special from Newcastle was worked throughout by Peak D192 (52A) instead of the usual V2; three of latter class failed on similar specials during April. On lst May, 70035 (40B) worked a special evening coke train from Coventry Gas Works to Immingham. Commencing April, a twice weekly car train is scheduled to run between the new Rootes factory at Linwood and the Rootes factory at Coventry; the trains run to Gosford Green goods station (Coventry avoiding line) arriving at 3-45 a.m. and are worked throughout by two Polmadie Type 1 d/es which then run to Rugby, l.e., and return from Gosford Green at 5 p.m. Since running, D8119-8128 have all been noted on this turn. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/06/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2946 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1622 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
24/07/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
08/11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
11/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1938. Dep: 24/02/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2666 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1940. Dep: 10/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2273 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1942. Dep: 04/07/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8581 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
28/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1945. Dep: 21/04/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2302 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4877 | ||
18/09/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
05/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1948. Dep: 16/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27527 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64877 |
||
28/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1950. Dep: 24/02/1950. | ||
07/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 07/09/1951. Dep: 02/10/1951. | ||
03/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1953. Dep: 23/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27487 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/11/1955. Dep: 10/12/1955. | ||
14/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/12/1955. Dep: 17/12/1955. | ||
09/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1957. Dep: 09/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27635 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/11/1957. Dep: 21/11/1957. | ||
23/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/10/1959. Dep: 28/11/1959. | ||
27/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64877 from Carlisle Canal (12C) | ||
06/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |