|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 28/10/1937 | 11/11/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 2684 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/11/1940 | 12/11/1940 | 11 days | General | Boiler number 2672 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 17/02/1943 | 05/03/1943 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 823 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1945 | 09/08/1945 | 11 days | General | Boiler number 2665 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/02/1948 | 26/03/1948 | 50 days | General | Renumbered to BR 64880 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 27/01/1950 | 22/02/1950 | 27 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/11/1950 | 07/12/1950 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 27578 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 15/06/1953 | 27/06/1953 | 13 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/03/1956 | 19/09/1956 | 185 days | General | Boiler number 27759 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/02/1959 | 13/03/1959 | 22 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 60152, 61072, 61117/18, 61307, 1751, 61764, 1780, 61784, 2474/76/88, 2684/94, 62733, 3058, 3168, 64575, 4586, 64621/28/36, 4786, 64877/80, 4919/40, 65923, 5924, 65932, 7453/80, 68100, 8323/44, 9170, 9214, 9507, 69595, 90505, ex-W.D. 77089, 77231, 73792. | SLS/195003 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/07/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2949 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1625 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
29/08/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
08/11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
07/02/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
28/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1937. Dep: 11/11/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2684 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/09/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
02/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1940. Dep: 12/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2672 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
17/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1943. Dep: 05/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 823 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1945. Dep: 09/08/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2665 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4880 | ||
13/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
06/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1948. Dep: 26/03/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64880 |
||
27/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/01/1950. Dep: 22/02/1950. | ||
14/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1950. Dep: 07/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27578 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1953. Dep: 27/06/1953. | ||
19/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1956. Dep: 19/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27759 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/02/1959. Dep: 13/03/1959. | ||
20/12/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (9G) | ||
20/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64880 from Gorton (9G) | ||
06/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |