|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 20/09/1937 | 15/10/1937 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 8018 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/09/1939 | 04/11/1939 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2772 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/08/1942 | 15/08/1942 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 8586 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 20/07/1945 | 30/08/1945 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 8584 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 05/08/1947 | 09/08/1947 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/09/1948 | 15/10/1948 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27455 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64884 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 02/05/1951 | 25/05/1951 | 24 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/10/1953 | 09/11/1953 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27539 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 14/12/1955 | 21/01/1956 | 39 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 30/04/1957 | 25/05/1957 | 26 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/11/1958 | 27/11/1958 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 27742 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/08/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2953 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1629 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
20/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1937. Dep: 15/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8018 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1939. Dep: 04/11/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2772 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1942. Dep: 15/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8586 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
25/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
20/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1945. Dep: 30/08/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8584 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4884 | ||
05/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/08/1947. Dep: 09/08/1947. | ||
23/09/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
15/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1948. Dep: 15/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27455 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64884 |
||
02/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 02/05/1951. Dep: 25/05/1951. | ||
10/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1953. Dep: 09/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27539 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 14/12/1955. Dep: 21/01/1956. | ||
30/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/04/1957. Dep: 25/05/1957. | ||
11/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1958. Dep: 27/11/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27742 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/03/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64884 from Carlisle Canal (12C) | ||
08/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |