|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 28/02/1938 | 19/03/1938 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 2688 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/08/1940 | 05/10/1940 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 2669 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1942 | 13/02/1943 | 70 days | General | Boiler number 2182 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/04/1944 | 20/04/1944 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 08/07/1945 | 15/09/1945 | 70 days | General | Boiler number 8025 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/04/1948 | 25/06/1948 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 4939 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64891 |
||
Derby Works | 26/07/1951 | 07/09/1951 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27674 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 29/10/1954 | 11/12/1954 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27658 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/09/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2987 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1638 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
21/10/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
28/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1938. Dep: 19/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2688 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/05/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
17/05/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
03/08/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
14/07/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
15/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1940. Dep: 05/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2669 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/10/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
06/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1942. Dep: 13/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2182 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/04/1944. Dep: 20/04/1944. | ||
08/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1945. Dep: 15/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8025 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
29/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4891 | ||
30/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1948. Dep: 25/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4939 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64891 |
||
26/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1951. Dep: 07/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27674 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/04/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
17/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
12/04/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) | ||
29/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1954. Dep: 11/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27658 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Plaistow (33A) | ||
26/05/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
25/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
08/02/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64891 from March (31B) | ||
28/02/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |