|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 25/05/1938 | 18/06/1938 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 2667 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1941 | 03/05/1941 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 2678 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 21/05/1944 | 17/06/1944 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 1931 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 19/06/1946 | 05/10/1946 | 109 days | General | Boiler number 27481 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 14/01/1949 | 26/03/1949 | 72 days | General | Boiler number BP130 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64897 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/02/1952 | 19/04/1952 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 27542 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/01/1956 | 11/02/1956 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27574 (Diagram 97) |
||
Inverurie Works | 15/08/1960 | 30/09/1960 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 27566 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/12/1961 | 16/01/1962 | 27 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/01/1962 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. | SLS/196203 |
14/04/1963 | Eastfield MPD (waiting Works) | 61008 transferred from LMR, ex Works-65916/32, and waiting Works-44194, 45713/24, 57653, 61147/80/346, 64527, 64790/814/44/69/97/910/24/9, 90060 an 90759. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/10/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2993 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1644 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
28/01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
25/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1938. Dep: 18/06/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2667 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/09/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
08/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1941. Dep: 03/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2678 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1944. Dep: 17/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1931 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
19/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1946. Dep: 05/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27481 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4897 | ||
04/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
10/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
14/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1949. Dep: 26/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number BP130 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64897 |
||
24/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
31/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
21/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1952. Dep: 19/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27542 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/01/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
28/03/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Alnmouth (52d) | ||
06/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1956. Dep: 11/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27574 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1960. Dep: 30/09/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27566 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/12/1961. Dep: 16/01/1962. | ||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64897 from Alnmouth (52D.1) | ||
04/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |