|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 23/04/1938 | 25/04/1938 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/08/1938 | 05/08/1938 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/10/1938 | 10/10/1938 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/11/1938 | 11/11/1938 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/02/1939 | 25/03/1939 | 40 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/04/1940 | 23/05/1940 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 27544 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1942 | 07/11/1942 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 27527 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/03/1944 | 11/04/1944 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/12/1944 | 20/01/1945 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2571 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/05/1946 | 25/05/1946 | 22 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4947 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 19/08/1946 | 24/08/1946 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 25/11/1947 | 10/04/1948 | 138 days | General | Boiler number 27525 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64947 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/02/1951 | 03/03/1951 | 26 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/09/1953 | 10/10/1953 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27515 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 13/12/1956 | 02/03/1957 | 80 days | General | Boiler number 27552 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/05/1957 | 12/06/1957 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/08/1958 | 11/10/1958 | 44 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/12/1959 | 06/02/1960 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 27587 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
21/08/1954 | Q1 on passenger train! | On Saturday 21/8/54 the unusual event occurred of a Q1 0-8-0T hauling a passenger train, albeit for a short distance. On this date B16/1 61470 (50B) failed with a blown middle cylinder cover between Gascoigne Woad and Hagg Lane whilst working the 9.45 a.m. passenger train from Leeds City to Hull. 69933 (50C), one of the Gascoigne Wood hump pilots, was requisitioned to haul the disabled engine and train into Selby, where 61470 was removed by 69933 to the shed and the train worked forward by J39 64947 (50F). | SLS/195410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/04/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1835 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1742 Allocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
23/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/04/1938. Dep: 25/04/1938. | ||
03/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/08/1938. Dep: 05/08/1938. | ||
06/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/10/1938. Dep: 10/10/1938. | ||
09/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/11/1938. Dep: 11/11/1938. | ||
14/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/02/1939. Dep: 25/03/1939. | ||
18/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1940. Dep: 23/05/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27544 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/01/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
06/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1942. Dep: 07/11/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27527 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
22/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
28/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/03/1944. Dep: 11/04/1944. | ||
18/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1944. Dep: 20/01/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2571 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/05/1946. Dep: 25/05/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4947 |
||
19/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/08/1946. Dep: 24/08/1946. | ||
25/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1947. Dep: 10/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27525 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64947 |
||
07/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
13/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
06/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/02/1951. Dep: 03/03/1951. | ||
11/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
10/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1953. Dep: 10/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27515 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/04/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Malton (50F) | ||
13/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1956. Dep: 02/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27552 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/05/1957. Dep: 12/06/1957. | ||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) | ||
12/01/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
29/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/08/1958. Dep: 11/10/1958. | ||
09/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1959. Dep: 06/02/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27587 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) | ||
23/05/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64947 from Neville Hill (55H) | ||
09/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |