|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 27/01/1940 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 07/1942 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 15/07/1944 | 1 day | General | Boiler number 1909 (Diagram 97) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 10/03/1947 | 02/05/1947 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 1922 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 30/08/1949 | 24/09/1949 | 26 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64950 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 27/03/1950 | 15/04/1950 | 20 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/11/1952 | 28/12/1952 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 27552 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 14/01/1953 | 06/02/1953 | 24 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/03/1954 | 24/04/1954 | 50 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/06/1954 | 26/06/1954 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Inverurie Works | 23/05/1956 | 25/05/1956 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/11/1956 | 07/12/1956 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27800 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 15/09/1960 | 29/10/1960 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 27842 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 13/09/1961 | 20/10/1961 | 38 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/10/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 61002/76, 61132, 1278, 61741/55/75, 1776, 61787, 61885, 61924, 62413/34, 2458, 62459, 2472, 62481, 3148, 63194, 64588, 4598, 4710, 4852/70, 4928, 64944, 4950, 5900, 65907, 7466, 67498, 67626/59/61, 68322, 8343, 8451/70/78, 69192, 69201/22, 9224, ex L.M.S. 4786, 44793, 54654, 56038, ex W.D. 77039/63, 77313/24, 90774. The only classes noted ex Cowlairs so far with the crest are 'B.1', 'J.39', 'K.2', 'K.3' and W.D. 2-8-0 and 2-10-0. No former N.B. engines have been noted with the crest, but many are lined in the latest style. | SLS/194911 |
12/06/1963 | Inverurie Works (Awaiting scrapping or shopping) | In Works: 42273, 45176, 61076, 61103, D8032. Shopped in four weeks ending 7th June : 64588, D362, D6155, 44960, 65930, 61404. Scrapped in same period: 64581, 65217/57/304, 64822, 65928; 64499, 65237. Being scrapped: 57617/31, 68346, 90077/575. Awaiting scrapping or shopping-64599/600, 64795, 64950/86. 64946 was waiting at Kittybrewster. | SLS/196307 |
02/11/1963 | Inverurie Works (Cut Up) | Shopped: 42737, 45475, D6149, D8030. Cut Up: 60819/27, 60937, 64627, 65253, 65341. Four weeks ending 30th November, 1963. Shopped: 42909, 44955, 65918, D6147/57. Cut Up: 57269, 57336, 57634, 60840/94, 64950, 64629. Four weeks ending 28th December, 1963. Shopped: 42919, 44703, D3930, D6140/42/45/52/54/55/56. Cut Up: 60898, 60972, 64557, 64600, 65900, 90019. Total for 1963: Steam-33 Shopped, 31 other repairs; Diesel-31 Shopped, 15 other repairs; Cut Up 86. Two weeks ending 10th January, 1964. Shopped: 61132, D6150. Cut Up: 60161, 64619. In Shops on 10th January: 44722, 64558/99, D368, D3935, D6139/51/53. Awaiting scrapping: 60089, 60159, 64579. | SLS/196402 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/04/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1863 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1745 Allocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
27/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1940. | ||
06/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/07/1942. | ||
08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
15/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1909 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4950 | ||
10/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1947. Dep: 02/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1922 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/08/1949. Dep: 24/09/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64950 |
||
27/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 27/03/1950. Dep: 15/04/1950. | ||
05/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1952. Dep: 28/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27552 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/01/1953. Dep: 06/02/1953. | ||
06/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/03/1954. Dep: 24/04/1954. | ||
02/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/06/1954. Dep: 26/06/1954. | ||
23/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/05/1956. Dep: 25/05/1956. | ||
06/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1956. Dep: 07/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27800 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1960. Dep: 29/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27842 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/09/1961. Dep: 20/10/1961. | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64950 | ||
08/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |