|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 05/06/1940 | 06/07/1940 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 4907 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/10/1943 | 13/11/1943 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 3177 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/11/1944 | 16/12/1944 | 27 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/09/1947 | 15/03/1947 | -184 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 10/02/1948 | 26/04/1948 | 77 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 64954 |
||
Gorton Works | 27/10/1949 | 09/11/1949 | 14 days | General | Boiler number 4979 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 19/01/1953 | 28/02/1953 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27744 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/03/1956 | 05/05/1956 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 27739 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 26/09/1957 | 02/10/1957 | 7 days | Light Casual | A.T.C. & Continuous blow-down fitted |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/05/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1926 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1750 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
05/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1940. Dep: 06/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4907 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/04/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
18/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
15/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1943. Dep: 13/11/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3177 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1944. Dep: 16/12/1944. | ||
07/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4954 | ||
15/03/1947 | Modification | Diagram 97 number C1710 boiler fitted | ||
06/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV) | ||
16/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1947. Dep: 15/03/1947. | ||
10/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/02/1948. Dep: 26/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64954 |
||
27/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1949. Dep: 09/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4979 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
01/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northwich (9G) | ||
07/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northwich (9G) | ||
12/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) | ||
19/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1953. Dep: 28/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27744 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1956. Dep: 05/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27739 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/05/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Plaistow (33A) | ||
26/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/09/1957. Dep: 02/10/1957. Work undertaken: A.T.C. & Continuous blow-down fitted |
||
31/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tilbury (33B) | ||
03/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
15/03/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64954 from Tilbury (33B) |