|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 12/01/1943 | 30/01/1943 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 4910 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/08/1945 | 13/09/1945 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 3211 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/10/1947 | 13/11/1947 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 2770 (Diagram 97) |
||
Derby Works | 30/11/1950 | 22/01/1951 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 27651 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64971 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/04/1953 | 19/05/1953 | 27 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/07/1955 | 19/09/1955 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 27572 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 25/04/1958 | 30/05/1958 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/03/1959 | 12/03/1959 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/10/1960 | 18/11/1960 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27580 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1950 | Derby Works | In addition to the normal types of L.M.S. origin, the following have come off works: 2060, 2107, 12011, 64749/82, 64807/34, 64958/9. Withdrawn engines in works yard: 3802, 20155, 22853, 58061. No. 20155 has had the number freshly painted on the smokebox door, and neatly enclosed in a white-painted rectangle. Buffer beam repainted, but boiler casing removed. Engines in for repair 2053 (82D), 12012 (8C), 12002 (5B), 64841 (32B), 64893 (36A), 64971 (40A), 64727 (9F), (6)4910 (36A), 64734 (40A), 64793 (32B), 64805 (39A), 42387/8 (87K); 7316 (71G); and the following other un-renumbered engines 7583 (26B), 2995 (18B), 524 (7B), 4294 (18A), 7131 (21A), 7298 (4A), 7300 (33A), 32 (14B); also numerous others of L.M.S. origin. Position as regards new construction on 30/11/50:-42062/3 almost complete; 42064/5 commenced; 12084/5 in paint shop, 12086 completed. Early in December another diesel, 12087 had the engines mounted, and the frames of 73000 were in the erecting shop. Among engines entering works were 509 (71G), 2988 (15B), 3827 (18A), 7503 (11C), 64802 (32A), 64979 (37A). Nos. 509, 43319 an 3827 were 'for special examination' and may not survive the ordeal. |
SLS/195101 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/02/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
07/02/1941 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3081 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1849 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
30/03/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
12/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1943. Dep: 30/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4910 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
28/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1945. Dep: 13/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3211 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4971 | ||
22/12/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
25/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1947. Dep: 13/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2770 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1950. Dep: 22/01/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27651 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64971 |
||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
23/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/04/1953. Dep: 19/05/1953. | ||
29/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1955. Dep: 19/09/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27572 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/04/1958. Dep: 30/05/1958. | ||
03/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/03/1959. Dep: 12/03/1959. | ||
10/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1960. Dep: 18/11/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27580 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/06/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64971 from Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
09/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |