|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 07/05/1942 | 12/06/1942 | 37 days | Light Repair | Due to enemy action |
||
Gorton Works | 24/03/1944 | 28/04/1944 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 8017 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/05/1946 | 21/09/1946 | 128 days | General | Boiler number 4914 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4981 |
||
Gorton Works | 22/10/1947 | 04/12/1947 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27772 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/04/1949 | 04/06/1949 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 8012 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64981 |
||
Derby Works | 12/11/1951 | 17/01/1952 | 67 days | General | Boiler number 27688 (Diagram 97) |
||
Derby Works | 21/02/1952 | 03/03/1952 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 24/08/1954 | 02/10/1954 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27697 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/01/1959 | Doncaster MPD (Stored) | On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). | SLS/195902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/05/1941 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3091 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1859 Allocated to Grantham (GRA) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
08/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
07/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/05/1942. Dep: 12/06/1942. Work undertaken: Due to enemy action |
||
24/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1944. Dep: 28/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8017 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1946. Dep: 21/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4914 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4981 |
||
22/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1947. Dep: 04/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27772 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1949. Dep: 04/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8012 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64981 |
||
20/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
26/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
12/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1951. Dep: 17/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27688 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/02/1952. Dep: 03/03/1952. | ||
27/04/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
17/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
12/04/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) | ||
24/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1954. Dep: 02/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27697 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Plaistow (33A) | ||
02/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
05/02/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64981 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
05/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |