Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1078 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18881 Week
» 71897 Month
» 191424 Year
» 3218277 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
176 |
m/e |
06/1915 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3176 |
m/e |
04/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8908 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
68908 |
w/e |
18/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J50 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
280 |
Works Number |
1464 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1915 to Ardsley (ARD) |
Withdrawal |
Mon 23/09/1963 |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 3 mths , 23 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
56F |
Low Moor |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
ALLOC |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
ALLOC |
51L |
Thornaby |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
ALLOC |
56F |
Low Moor |
4w/e |
21/02/1959 |
ALLOC |
56A |
Wakefield |
5w/e |
12/01/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/09/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1915 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 176 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1464 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
04/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3176 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8908 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) |
|
|
18/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68908 |
|
|
08/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) |
|
|
10/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
31/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
23/09/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68908 |
|
|