Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 544 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18347 Week
» 71363 Month
» 190890 Year
» 3217743 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3238 |
m/e |
05/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8937 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
68937 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J50 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
300 |
Works Number |
1596 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 05/1924 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 23/09/1963 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 4 mths , 24 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
56B |
Ardsley |
4w/e |
05/10/1957 |
ALLOC |
56D |
Mirfield |
3w/e |
31/03/1962 |
ALLOC |
56B |
Ardsley |
5w/e |
05/05/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/09/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
07/04/1951 |
Southend Line |
Owing to turntable repairs at Liverpool Street, there were no reasonable facilities for turning the B1 and B12 class engines which normally work the Southend trains. Since the Date: w/e 7th April, the service has been almost entirely worked by A5 engines transferred from Norwich and the North Eastern Region. Engines observed since this arrangement started are 68932/5/7/8/40/2. On occasions, these engines have not distinguished themselves, and N7 Tanks have had to take over at least twice. 69704 was observed running very fast with the 9.58 up on Saturday 21st April. No doubt, part of the difficulties being experienced with these engines are due to the crews having little knowledge of this type. Also, with the serious shortage of footplate men, young lads of 15-16 years of age, are often called out to fire these big machines. |
SLS/195106 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1924 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3238 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1596 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8937 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68937 |
|
|
21/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) |
|
|
17/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) |
|
|
05/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) |
|
|
23/09/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68937 |
|
|