Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1467 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19270 Week
» 72286 Month
» 191813 Year
» 3218666 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
1074 |
m/e |
01/1927 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8967 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
British Railways |
68967 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J50 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
308 |
Works Number |
1664 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 01/1927 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 16/06/1959 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 5 mths , 16 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1927 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
40B |
|
Immingham |
4w/e |
18/02/1956 |
38A |
|
Colwick |
4w/e |
22/09/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/06/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
40B |
Immingham |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
15/09/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/06/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1074 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1664 |
|
|
20/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8967 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68967 |
|
|
18/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
22/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
16/06/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68967 |
|
|