Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 680 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14086 Week
» 67102 Month
» 186629 Year
» 3213482 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
602 |
m/e |
12/1938 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8980 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
68980 |
m/e |
10/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J50 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1938 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 22/02/1960 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 2 mths , 23 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
DON |
Doncaster |
9w/e |
31/03/1946 |
ALLOC |
36B |
Mexborough |
w/e |
17/11/1951 |
ALLOC |
36C |
Frodingham |
4w/e |
13/06/1953 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
26/05/1956 |
ALLOC |
34B |
Hornsey |
4w/e |
01/11/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/02/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1938 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 602 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8980 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
10/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68980 |
|
|
17/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) |
|
|
20/06/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
25/05/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
15/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
22/02/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68980 |
|
|