Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 121 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17924 Week
» 70940 Month
» 190467 Year
» 3217320 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1269 |
m/e |
03/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4269 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8868 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
68868 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
227 |
Works Number |
962 |
To Service |
During 03/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 28/10/1955 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1902 |
NWE |
|
New England |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
37A |
|
Ardsley |
4w/e |
19/09/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
28/10/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
37A |
Ardsley |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
28/10/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1269 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 962 |
|
|
10/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4269 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8868 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68868 |
|
|
19/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) |
|
|
28/10/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68868 |
|
|